Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Maguire

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Ilium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1882Born
22 Jul 190623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Oct 193957.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Oct 193957.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ilium
30 Nov 193957.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ilium
10 Oct 194462.1DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Maguire
Bishop James Maguire (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Dunkeld

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoanhead, Midlothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Death PlaceSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Balgay, Cemetery, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 73
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 1 Apr 2018