Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Brann

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1483AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
4 May 1483Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
1484²AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
1485²ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
1497²AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, England, Great Britain
1497²AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
16 Apr 1499AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
1504¹ResignedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
Oct 1529²DiedBishop Emeritus of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Brann
Bishop George Brann (died Oct 1529) Bishop Emeritus of Elphin

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Laurent in Damaso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 46.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 146, and Page 150
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Oct 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1483, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Dec 2018

Quantcast