Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Smith

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Mosynopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1684¹Born
19 Apr 171228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Scotland, Great Britain
19 Sep 173551.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
19 Sep 173551.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
13 Nov 173551.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mosynopolis
18 Feb 174662.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
21 Aug 176783.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Smith
Bishop Alexander Smith (born 1684, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFochabers, Moray
Ordained BishopEdimburg

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 292, and Page 455
  • bd/opd: CB, 17 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,033

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 10 Jun 2020

Quantcast