Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcantonio Cardinal Barbarigo

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1640BornVenice
6 Jun 167838.3AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
26 Jun 167838.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
2 Sep 168646.5Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 168646.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
7 Jul 168747.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
1 Jul 169757.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
26 May 170666.2DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Barbarigo:
Cardinal Marcantonio Barbarigo (born , died ) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
  • a cardinal for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013