Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gianfrancesco Cardinal Negroni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Faenza

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1629BornGenoa
2 Sep 168656.9Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 168657.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
7 Jul 168757.8AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
2 Jan 169666.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
11 Nov 169768.1ResignedBishop of Faenza, Italy
1 Jan 171383.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianfrancesco Negroni:
Cardinal Gianfrancesco Negroni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Faenza

  • a cardinal for 26.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013