Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Spínola

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625¹Born
22 Apr 166540.3AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
13 Sep 169469.6AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
7 Jan 170580.0DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Spínola
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Spínola (born 1625, died ) Archbishop of Genova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 155
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 226
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018