Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Giacomo Castellani, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1619BornUrbino
1 Apr 168666.3AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
15 Apr 168666.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
Jan 1694³74.1DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Giacomo Castellani:
Bishop Giulio Giacomo Castellani O.S.A. (born , died Jan 1694) Bishop of Cagli

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1686, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015