Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valeriano Chierichelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornCamerino
21 Jun 169448.4AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
27 Jun 169448.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
14 May 171872.3ResignedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
13 Aug 172276.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ferentino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valeriano Chierichelli:
Bishop Valeriano Chierichelli (born 1646, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ferentino

  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015