Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Visconti Aicardi, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Novara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644BornMilano
4 Apr 166521.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
31 May 168844.4AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
8 Jun 168844.4Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
10 Aug 171369.6DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Visconti Aicardi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Visconti Aicardi B. (died ) Bishop of Novara

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013