Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Federico Carafa, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1656BornRio Nero
22 Jul 167922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
25 Jan 169437.4AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
31 Jan 169437.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
7 Apr 170447.6AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
6 Jan 173780.4DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Federico Carafa:
Bishop Francesco Maria Federico Carafa C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Nola

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 255, and Page 291
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 29 Apr 2015