Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Crespino

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1652BornNapoli
30 Mar 167522.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 169239.8AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
19 Jul 169442.2AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
Sep 1697³45.3DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Crespino:
Bishop Gennaro Crespino (born , died Sep 1697) Bishop of Squillace

  • a priest for 22.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 270, and Page 363
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015