Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Lorenzo Ibáñez de Arilla, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1661³Born
22 Dec 168524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
14 Jan 169735.2AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
20 Jan 169735.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tropea, Italy
21 Oct 172665.0DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Lorenzo Ibáñez de Arilla
Bishop Juan Lorenzo Ibáñez de Arilla O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 392
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 239, Number 1,480
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018