Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maioranus Figlioli

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1640Born
15 May 166727.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 169655.8AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
26 Feb 169655.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
27 May 171272.1DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maioranus Figlioli
Bishop Maioranus Figlioli (born , died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolfetta

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,696, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast