Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Lambert Ledrou, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1641²BornHuy, Belgium
12 Apr 166423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
25 Jun 169251.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
21 Dec 169251.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
6 May 172180.3DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Lambert Ledrou:
Bishop Pierre Lambert Ledrou O.S.A. (died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 320
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015