Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Capilupi

Deceased

Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1653BornMatera
21 Mar 167622.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Mar 167824.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 169440.7AppointedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
19 Sep 169440.7Ordained BishopBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
3 May 171662.3DiedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Capilupi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Capilupi (born , died ) Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015