Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Ernest de L÷wenstein-Wertheim

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1667BornWertheim
22 May 171345.9AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
24 Feb 171446.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 171446.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
26 Jul 173164.1DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean-Ernest de L÷wenstein-Wertheim:
Bishop Jean-Ernest de L÷wenstein-Wertheim (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 17.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1714, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015