Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Paul Ernest de Berlo de Brus

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1654³BornNamur
29 Feb 167621.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Sep 167622.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 169743.4AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
29 Dec 169743.5Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
24 Aug 172571.2DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Paul Ernest de Berlo de Brus:
Bishop Ferdinand Paul Ernest de Berlo de Brus (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1697, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015