Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Clemens von Bayern von Wittelsbach

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Bishop of Hildesheim

Bishop of Ličge

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1671BornMünchen
168311.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
9 Jul 168311.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
27 Nov 168412.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Freising, Germany
6 Oct 168513.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Freising, Germany
4 Nov 168513.9SucceededBishop of Regensburg, Germany
4 Nov 168513.9SucceededBishop of Freising, Germany
19 Jul 168816.6SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
20 Sep 168816.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
8 Jan 169422.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
20 Apr 169422.3SelectedBishop of Ličge, Belgium
29 Sep 169422.8ConfirmedBishop of Ličge, Belgium
6 Nov 169422.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
22 May 169927.4AppointedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
13 Aug 170230.6SucceededBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
18 Dec 170534.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 170735.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Nov 172351.9DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Clemens von Bayern von Wittelsbach:
Archbishop Joseph Clemens von Bayern von Wittelsbach (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 17.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 164, and Page 205
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 221, and Page 242
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015