Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis François Rossius de Liboy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1662BornLiege
168724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
18 Jun 169633.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
18 Jun 169633.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
5 Aug 169633.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
25 Nov 172866.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Louis François Rossius de Liboy:
Bishop Louis François Rossius de Liboy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015