Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Louis Sanguessa, O.F.M. Rec. †

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1663BornMalines
7 Sep 172057.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
28 May 172157.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
28 May 172157.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
10 Aug 172158.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
9 Apr 172258.8SucceededBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
19 Jul 172764.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
1728¹64.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
11 Aug 174178.1DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Louis Sanguessa:
Bishop François Louis Sanguessa O.F.M. Rec. (born , died ) Bishop of Roermond

  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 132, and Page 337
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 401
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015