Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Joseph de Franken-Sierstof

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1667Born
15 Dec 171043.7AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
25 Oct 171144.5Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
19 Oct 172760.5DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Joseph de Franken-Sierstof
Bishop Pierre-Joseph de Franken-Sierstof (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonn

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast