Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Santini

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Poland

Titular Archbishop of Trapezus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1676³BornLucca, Italy
10 Oct 171337.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
9 Feb 172144.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Mar 172144.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 172145.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
Jun 1721³45.2ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
10 Aug 172145.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
13 Aug 172145.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
14 Nov 172145.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
12 Jan 172245.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
5 Jul 172852.3DiedApostolic Nuncio to Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Santini (VIAF: 89422344)
Archbishop Vincenzo Santini (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Poland

  • a priest for 7.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 386
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 33
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016