Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelus d’Ongnies et d’Estrées, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1650BornBruxelles
25 Feb 167322.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Feb 167423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Nov 170150.9AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
1 Jan 170251.0Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
9 Apr 172271.3DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Angelus d’Ongnies et d’Estrées:
Bishop Angelus d’Ongnies et d’Estrées O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Roermond

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015