Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guilielmus (Willem) Bassery

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1642BornBrussels
16 Dec 168139.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
13 Nov 169048.1AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
7 Jan 169148.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
18 Jun 170663.7DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Guilielmus (Willem) Bassery:
Bishop Guilielmus (Willem) Bassery (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 128, and Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015