Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Orazio Filippo Cardinal Spada

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1659BornLucca
27 Mar 169434.2Ordained PriestPriest
Apr 1696³36.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
15 Sep 169838.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
11 Oct 169838.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
Nov 1698³38.8ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
7 Dec 169838.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
5 Jun 170242.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
22 Dec 170344.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
15 Dec 170444.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lucca, Italy
17 May 170646.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Oct 170646.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
21 Mar 170747.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
17 Jan 171454.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osimo, Italy
28 Jun 172464.5DiedBishop of Osimo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Filippo Spada (VIAF: 89065691)
Orazio Filippo Cardinal Spada (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
  • a cardinal for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 26
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016