Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adam Daemen

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

Titular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1670¹BornAmsterdam
9 Feb 170737.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
9 Feb 170737.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
25 Dec 170737.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
30 Dec 171747.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Daemen:
Archbishop Adam Daemen (born 1670, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015