Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliks Ignacy Kretkowski

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1657BornChelmno
168729.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
7 Dec 172265.3SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
30 Aug 172366.1ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
31 Oct 172366.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
6 Dec 173073.3DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Feliks Ignacy Kretkowski:
Bishop Feliks Ignacy Kretkowski (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 178
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,017
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1723, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015