Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan-Baptist de Smet

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1674BornLokeren
3 Feb 172147.0AppointedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
20 Apr 172147.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
4 Aug 173056.5SelectedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
6 Aug 173157.5ConfirmedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
18 Jun 173258.4InstalledBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
27 Sep 174167.7DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jan-Baptist de Smet:
Bishop Jan-Baptist de Smet (born 1674, died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1741
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 420
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015