Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas John Francis de Strickland de Sizorghe

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680¹Born
9 Apr 170727.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 May 170929.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 172747.0AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
28 Sep 172747.7Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
12 Jan 174060.0DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas John Francis de Strickland de Sizorghe
Bishop Thomas John Francis de Strickland de Sizorghe (born 1680, died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGreat Britain

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018