Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sylvester Louis Lloyd, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680²Born
30 May 171131.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 172848.6SelectedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
25 Sep 172848.7ConfirmedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
27 Mar 172949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
13 May 173959.3SelectedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
29 May 173959.4ConfirmedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
Aug 1747³67.5DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sylvester Louis Lloyd
Bishop Sylvester Louis Lloyd O.F.M. (born 1680, died Aug 1747) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Death PlaceParis

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 446
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 12
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast