Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hendrik Jozef van Susteren

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1668BornAmsterdam
19 Sep 169325.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 171547.4AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
22 Mar 171647.7Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
24 Feb 174273.6DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Hendrik Jozef van Susteren:
Bishop Hendrik Jozef van Susteren (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013