Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles d’Espinoza, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1659BornTeneramundano
17 Mar 168525.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Dec 168525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Sep 172262.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricale
30 Nov 172363.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricale
14 Jun 172868.4AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
31 Jul 174282.5DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Charles d’Espinoza:
Bishop Charles d’Espinoza O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 90, and Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015