Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic O’Daly, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1677¹Born
27 Aug 169720.6EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Dec 170225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Sep 172548.6SelectedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
20 Sep 172548.7ConfirmedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
30 Nov 172548.9Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
6 Jan 173558.0DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominic O’Daly
Bishop Dominic O’Daly O.P. (born 1677, died ) Bishop of Achonry

EventPlace
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceCastlebar, Co. Mayo

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 67
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 47
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast