Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Grimaldi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1674BornGenoa, Italy
Jun 1706³31.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
19 Mar 170934.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Apr 170934.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 171237.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
30 Dec 171238.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
9 Apr 171338.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
Oct 1713³38.8ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
22 Nov 172046.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
Feb 1721³46.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
2 Oct 173055.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 May 173156.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
3 Sep 173156.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
18 Nov 173359.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Grimaldi (VIAF: 89071006)
Girolamo Cardinal Grimaldi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
  • a cardinal for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1730
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1713, Number 6
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016