Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philipp Ludwig Cardinal von Sinzendorf

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1699BornParis, France
172222.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
5 May 172525.8SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
11 Sep 172627.1ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
17 Nov 172627.3Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
26 Nov 172728.3Elevated to Cardinal
14 Aug 173031.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
10 Jul 173232.9SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
3 Sep 173233.1ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
6 Nov 173233.3InstalledBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
28 Sep 174748.2DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Philipp Ludwig von Sinzendorf:
Philipp Ludwig Cardinal von Sinzendorf (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 25.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
  • a cardinal for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015