Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Franciszek Bernard Sapieha, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1657³Born
25 Mar 168830.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Jan 171557.7AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
2 May 171558.0Ordained BishopBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
1 Oct 171558.4DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Paweł Franciszek Bernard Sapieha
Bishop Paweł Franciszek Bernard Sapieha O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZurawno
Ordained BishopWarszawa

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 343
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1715, Number 21
  • b/c2+: CB, 30 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016