Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krzysztof Andrzej Jan Szembek

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1680BornSłupów
30 Jul 171131.2SelectedBishop of Chełm, Poland
22 May 171333.0ConfirmedBishop of Chełm, Poland
27 Aug 171333.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
15 Mar 171938.8AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
14 Feb 172443.7SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
11 Sep 172444.3ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
16 Mar 174059.8DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Andrzej Jan Szembek:
Bishop Krzysztof Andrzej Jan Szembek (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 156, and Page 324
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 405
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015