Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Piechowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1670¹BornPoznan
12 Feb 172151.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
12 Feb 172151.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
10 Aug 172151.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
10 Feb 172454.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Michael Piechowski:
Bishop Michael Piechowski (born 1670, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015