Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Sabbatini, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Modena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1684BornFanano
19 Mar 170622.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
20 Mar 172642.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
19 May 172642.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
8 Mar 174561.2AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
3 Jun 175773.4DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Sabbatini:
Bishop Giulio Sabbatini Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop of Modena

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013