Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Franz Anton von Kevenhüller

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wiener Neustadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1707BornKlagenfurt
25 Nov 172922.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Augsburg, Germany
10 Apr 173022.3Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
19 Jun 173426.5SelectedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
15 Dec 173427.0ConfirmedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
24 Feb 173527.2Ordained BishopBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
22 Dec 174033.0ResignedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
2 Apr 176254.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann Franz Anton von Kevenhüller:
Bishop Johann Franz Anton von Kevenhüller (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wiener Neustadt

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015