Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Stanislavich, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1694BornCraioven en Valachie
19 Dec 171622.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
11 Apr 171722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Jun 172531.0AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
24 Jun 172531.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
21 Oct 173945.4SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
30 Sep 174046.3ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
15 Jul 175056.1DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Nicola Stanislavich:
Bishop Nicola Stanislavich O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Csanád

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 289
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 188
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015