Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Gaetano Chiurlia (Chyurlia), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Giovinazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1659BornRoma
24 Aug 169334.6AppointedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
20 Sep 169334.7Ordained BishopBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
23 Mar 173071.2DiedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Gaetano Chiurlia (Chyurlia)
Bishop Giacinto Gaetano Chiurlia (Chyurlia) O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Giovinazzo

  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1693, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 14 Feb 2016