Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Mazzocca, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1656BornVenezia
8 May 167316.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Sep 167923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Jun 172568.7AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
24 Jun 172568.7Ordained BishopBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
14 May 173275.6DiedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Mazzocca:
Bishop Vittorio Mazzocca O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 71
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013