Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop NicolÚ Maria de’ Franchi, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1657BornAlbisola
1 Jul 172668.8AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
7 Jul 172668.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Genova, Italy
20 Feb 174688.4DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Maria de’ Franchi:
Archbishop NicolÚ Maria de’ Franchi O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013