Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Burgos, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1666³BornMessina
23 Sep 169023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
21 Nov 172558.8SelectedBishop of Catania, Italy
20 Feb 172659.1ConfirmedBishop of Catania, Italy
10 Mar 172659.2Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
20 Jul 172659.5DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Burgos:
Bishop Alessandro Burgos O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Catania

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 150
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015