Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Gualtieri, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1672³BornNapoli
Dec 1696³24.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
21 Feb 172552.4AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
4 Mar 172552.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera, Italy
Oct 1726³54.0DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alberto Gualtieri:
Bishop Alberto Gualtieri O.F.M. Disc. (born , died Oct 1726) Bishop of Nicotera

  • a priest for 29.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1725, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015