Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Bussi

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1688BornRoma
20 Apr 171527.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 172739.2AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
14 Jul 172739.3Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
2 Oct 172840.5DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Bussi:
Bishop Benedetto Bussi (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

  • a priest for 13.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1728
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013