Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean François Fouquet, S.J. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1663Born
21 Mar 172562.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
25 Mar 172562.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
14 Mar 174178.0DiedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia

MicroData Summary for Jean François Fouquet
Bishop Jean François Fouquet S.J. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAeduen

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 193
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,725, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast