Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Joseph-Amable Feydeau, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Digne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1659BornMoulins
18 Dec 168324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
26 Nov 172869.2SelectedBishop of Digne, France
11 Sep 173071.0ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
24 Sep 173071.0Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
3 Dec 174182.2DiedBishop of Digne, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Joseph-Amable Feydeau:
Bishop Antoine-Joseph-Amable Feydeau O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Digne

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013