Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elzear des Achards de La Baume

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Halicarnassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1679³BornAvignon
31 Jul 172647.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
11 Aug 172647.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
2 Apr 174162.1DiedTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Elzear des Achards de La Baume:
Bishop Elzear des Achards de La Baume (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Halicarnassus

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 216
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015